Janssen, Henricus Leonardus Antonius (CPSO#: 99771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jan 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:Katholieke Universiteit Nijmegen, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Room 234 (9 EB 234)
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3569
Fax: (416) 340-4533
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Henricus Leonardus Antonius Janssen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Juan ( CPSO# 99047 )
Dr. H. Janssen ( CPSO# 99771 )

Business Address:
The Francis Family Liver Clinic
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, 9th Floor Eaton Building
Room 215
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5375

Business Address:
Suite 9EB234
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 340-4172

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 234 (9 EB 234)
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4605

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Netherlands

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 15 Jan 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Feb 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Henricus Leonardus Antonius Janssen may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in   a   setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Division  of
                        Gastroenterology, Department of Medicine, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Janssen holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Janssen no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.