skip to content

Jansen, Marcus Cole

CPSO#: 95921

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Synergy
Sports Medicine & Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto ON  M6H1V5
Phone: 416-703-3525
Fax: 647-343-8073 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Hull-Ellis Concussion Clinic
10th Floor
550 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 3226
Fax: 416-597-7169
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

11 King St West, Suite C-120
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Canada
Phone: 416-368-9990
Fax: 416-479-8688
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marcus Jansen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jansen ( CPSO# 95921 )

Business Address:
235 Wallace Ave
Synergy Sports Medicine and Rehabilitation
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Phone Number: 416-703-3525

Business Address:
Sports Medicine & Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Avenue
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Phone Number: (416) 703-3525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARCUS COLE JANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013