skip to content

Jansen, Jan Willem

CPSO#: 88037

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jan 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French, German

Education:Free University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster University Medical Centre Department of Pathology 1200 Main Street West Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015