skip to content

Janjua, Meer Mahmood Muneer

CPSO#: 96353

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1530 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1B4 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Meer Janjua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEER MAHMOOD MUNEER JANJUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANJUA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
EL - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2016