skip to content

Przysiezny, Janine Marie

CPSO#: 73497

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Robertson, Janine Marie (used until: 08 Nov 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
460 Springbank Drive
Suite 205
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: 519-614-6649
Fax: 844-225-4616 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Przysiezny Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Przysiezny ( CPSO# 73497 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 637-0511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:20 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANINE MARIE PRZYSIEZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRZYSIEZNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 20 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005