skip to content

Jang, Karen Yuen Kiu

CPSO#: 90815

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6225 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

9060 Jane St
Concord ON  L4K 0G5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

610 University Avenue, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 416-946-2297
Fax: (416) 946-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

10 John Birchall Rd #2
Richmond Hill ON  L4S0B2
Canada
Phone: 9057808446
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Talk Shop Clinic
5110 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M2N 5W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 338-7000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Jang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 15 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN YUEN KIU JANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 28 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011