skip to content

Jang, Benjamin Shu Kuen

CPSO#: 95436

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1288 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1M6
Phone: 416-462-0228
Fax: 416-461-7690 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 William Graham Drive
Aurora ON  L4G3G3
Canada
Phone: 905-841-3450
Fax: 905-727-2111
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

226 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J2T8
Canada
Phone: 705-740-0228
Fax: 705-740-0223
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Benjamin Jang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jang ( CPSO# 95436 )

Business Address:
25 William Graham Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 3G3
Phone Number: (905) 841-3450

Business Address:
1288 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1M6
Phone Number: (416) 462-0228

Business Address:
226 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2T8
Phone Number: (705) 740-0228

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN SHU KUEN JANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013