skip to content

Jancelewicz, Zygmunt

CPSO#: 24847

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Z Jancelewicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Tele: 416-532-6837
Date Received: 15 Jul 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2020