skip to content

Janardanan Nair, Vimoj

CPSO#: 96718

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Irving Greenberg Family Cancer Ctr
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
rio
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vimoj Janardanan Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Janardanan Nair ( CPSO# 96718 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
Irving Greenberg Family Cancer Centre
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:27 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIMOJ JANARDANAN NAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANARDANAN NAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2011 to 10 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 11 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Aug 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017