skip to content

James, Patricia Mary

CPSO#: 20889

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1990