skip to content

James, Aisha Nyota Pia

CPSO#: 91306

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unison Health And
Community Services
1541 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M9N 2R3
Phone: (416) 645-7575
Fax: (416) 645-7570 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Life Clinic
101 Queensway
Suite 400
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Canada
Phone: 9053660053
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aisha James Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. James ( CPSO# 91306 )

Business Address:
Unison Health and Community Services
1541 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M9N 2R3
Phone Number: (416) 645-7575

Business Address:
Life Clinic
400-101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 366-0053

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AISHA NYOTA PIA JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012