skip to content

Young, James Wen

CPSO#: 72793

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 04 Mar 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Young ( CPSO# 72793 )

Business Address:
7 Sandfield Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2B5
Phone Number: (647) 525-7899

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 2020
Summary:

On September 27, 2019, allegations of Dr. Young’s professional misconduct were 
 referred to the Discipline Committee. The allegations included that Dr. Young engaged 
 in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct by, in part, misleading a 
 College assessor; and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his 
 documentation, infection control practices, and in his professionalism. 
  
 The matter was heard on December 9, 2020 by way of videoconference, in the presence 
 of Dr. Young, counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Young. On the basis of an 
 Agreed Statement of Facts on Liability and Penalty, the Discipline Committee found that 
 Dr. Young committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in 
 disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct and failed to maintain the 
standard of practice of the profession. The Committee reserved its decision on penalty. 
 
On March 3, 2021, the Committee released its full reasons for decision, including its 
order on Penalty. The Committee ordered and directed: 

•  The Registrar to suspend Dr. Young’s certificate of registration for a period of three 
   months, commencing on the day following release of the order. 

•  Dr. Young to attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 

•  The Registrar to impose terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Young’s certificate 
   of registration, including a requirement to take the PROBE course on ethics and 
   professionalism; practice observation and reassessment 

•  Dr. Young to pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $6,000. 
The decision is available for review on the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): December 9, 2020

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Nov 2016
Summary:

On November 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. James Wen Young committed an act of professional misconduct in that he 
has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
 
Dr. Young, an anesthesiologist practicing in Toronto, received his specialist qualification in 
anesthesiology in 2003. Dr. Young has had privileges at the Humber River Regional Hospital 
(the “Hospital”) since 2003 and currently practises full-time anaesthesiology there. During the 
relevant time period, Dr. Young worked at the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic one day per month as 
one of a group of anaesthesiologists from the Hospital. 
 
Dr. Young entered a plea of no contest based on the following statement of uncontested facts: 
 
HEPATITIS C OUTBREAK AT THE ONTARIO ENDOSCOPY CLINIC 
 
On April 28, 2014 the College received a complaint from a patient that she had contracted 
Hepatitis C as a result of a gastroscopy performed at the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic. The patient 
had obtained this information after being advised by Toronto Public Health regarding a Hepatitis 
C outbreak at the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic.  
 
The Toronto Public Health investigation found that five patients became infected with Hepatitis 
C during their procedures at the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic on March 15, 2013, a day when Dr. 
Young was working as one of two anaesthesiologists at the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic. Toronto 
Public Health concluded that the source patient, Patient A, was the fourth of 10 patients who had 
procedures in the same procedure room with the same endoscopist and the same 
anaesthesiologist (Dr. Young) on that day. All except one of the patients who had a procedure 
following Patient A acquired Hepatitis C. The investigation ruled out contamination of the 
endoscopes as a source of the contamination since a different scope had been used on each of the 
five patients that contracted Hepatitis C. 
 
Toronto Public Health conducted a review of Dr. Young’s practice, including a direct interview 
and observation of his practice at the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic on August 16, 2013. Toronto 
Public Health also conducted a look-back of patients who had a procedure at the Ontario 
Endoscopy Clinic in the five years prior to the date of transmission and were cared for by Dr. 
Young. No additional newly Hepatitis C or HBV-infected individuals were found. 
 
While observing that Dr. Young separated unused and used syringes on the anaesthesia cart, and 
observing that needles were not re-used and re-inserted into the medication bottle if more 
medication was required, Toronto Public Health noted that the literature supported the theory 
that Hepatitis C transmission occurs in health care settings as a result of mishandling of multi-
dose injectable medications.  
 
The use of multi-dose injectables, while common, presents greater risk when used in a high 
volume, rapid turnover environment. 
 
Toronto Public Health concluded that it was possible that a multi-dose vial of medication, most 
likely lidocaine, became contaminated with blood from Patient A, and was used during the 


 
 

subsequent procedures on that day. It noted that lidocaine was the one vial used for all patient 
procedures that day, while the propofol vial would not have provided enough doses for all patient 
procedures subsequent to Patient A. 
 
CLINICAL CARE ISSUES IDENTIFIED BY COLLEGE EXPERTS 
 
The College retained two medical inspectors to conduct an investigation into Dr. Young’s 
practice. The College’s experts reviewed the charts of the patients who had been provided with 
anesthesia by Dr. Young during their procedures at the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic on the day in 
question, interviewed Dr. Young and observed his practice providing anaesthesia for endoscopy 
procedures at the Hospital. 
 
The first College expert  opined that: 
   -  Dr. Young failed to properly review Patient A’s chart, including the pre-anesthesia 
      questionnaire, to determine whether there were any anaesthesia associated risks;  
   -  Dr. Young did not see that the patient had checked off “hepatitis” in the questionnaire 
      and may have taken additional precautions based on this information; 
   -  This failure created a significant risk to patient safety; 
   -  Dr. Young should have been aware of the risks of using a multi-dose vial regardless of 
      time or cost pressures that might have been in play at the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic level; 
   -  Despite Dr. Young’s statement that he never re-enters a multi-dose vial with a used 
      syringe, this is the most plausible explanation for the sequence of Hepatitis C cases that 
      occurred on March 15, 2013; 
   -  Dr. Young should have been aware of the importance of reviewing a patient’s medical 
      history; 
   -  Dr. Young’s care did display a lack of judgment, but did not display a lack of skill or 
      knowledge; 
   -  Despite the fact that he could not control what the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic ordered in 
      terms of stack vial size, he could have exercised increased caution when using large 
      multi-dose vials. 
 
The first expert concluded that transmission of Hepatitis C likely occurred as a result of 
contamination of a multi-dose vial, likely of propofol, by Dr. Young. The expert concluded that 
the degree of deficit in this case was mild and that Dr. Young appeared to have learned from the 
experience at the Ontario Endoscopy Clinic and concluded that Dr. Young’s current clinical 
practice, behaviour or conduct does not expose and is not likely to expose patients to harm or 
injury.  
 
The second College expert opined that the documentation in the anaesthetic record completed by 
Dr. Young for Patient A and the 6 patients who followed her was deficient and below standards 
of practice in one or more of the following areas: 
   -  No pre-operative vitals (in two out of seven cases); 
   -  No post-operative vitals or level of consciousness; 
   -  No discharge orders; 
   -  No pre-operative airway assessment. 
 


 
 

The second expert opined that with respect to Patient A, the anaesthetic record was deficient in 
having no pre-operative blood glucose despite her history of diabetes and insulin use, no notation 
of the patient’s history of Hepatitis C, and no documentation of her history of chest pain. 
 
The second expert concluded that Dr. Young did not meet standards of practice in that he was 
not aware that Patient A was Hepatitis C positive although the patient questionnaire indicated a 
history of Hepatitis C. There was an increased potential for harm in not being aware that the 
patient was Hepatitis C positive. Dr. Young did not meet the standards of practice regarding 
infection control procedures. It is extremely likely that the 5 patients were infected with Hepatitis 
C from contaminated intravenous medication administered by Dr. Young, In addition, there were 
poor infection control practices observed both in medication preparation (e.g., not cleaning the 
tops of vials before re-entering) as well as failure to change gloves frequently enough and 
disposal of contaminated syringes in a bio-medical waste bin. 
 
The second College expert reported that Dr. Young displayed a lack of knowledge regarding 
appropriate infection control techniques with respect to multi-dose vials and that Dr. Young’s 
clinical practice exposed five patients to harm as they were infected with Hepatitis C. 
 
On November 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. On 
June 19, 2017, the Discipline Committee released its decision on penalty and ordered 
that: 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Young’s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months commencing immediately. 
   -  The Registrar  impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Young’s 
      certificate of registration: 
            (i)   Dr. Young shall take a course on infection control as approved by the 
                  College within six (6) months of the date of this Order and provide proof 
                  of completion of same to the College; 
            (ii)  Dr. Young shall be subject to an assessment of his practice, including but 
                  not limited to an observation of his sterile technique, his preoperative 
                  process and his record keeping within six (6) months of his return to 
                  practice after the end of the suspension referred to above; and 
            (iii) Dr. Young shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs 
                  charges and expenses, arising from the implementation of this order. 
   -  Dr. Young appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -  Dr. Young pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,000.00 within sixty (60) days of 
      the date of this order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 28 & 29, 2016