skip to content

Jamal, Zahra

CPSO#: 97044

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1500-150 York St
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: 4163505900 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zahra Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jamal ( CPSO# 97044 )

Business Address:
200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2J1
Phone Number: (416) 368-6787

Business Address:
150 York St
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seen at MCI "The Doctor's Office", please contact: 200 Bay Street Lower Concourse PO Box 134 Toronto ON M5J 2J1 Phone: (416) 368-6787 Fax: (416) 368-7632
Date Received: 14 May 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZAHRA JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2011