skip to content

Jamal, Dried Emad

CPSO#: 94735

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4D-65 Donly Dr N
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone: 5194260011
Fax: 5194261671 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dried Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 20 2020
Corporation Name: DR. DRIED JAMAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jamal ( CPSO# 94735 )

Business Address:
264 Main St E
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P8
Phone Number: 647-622-6868


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ontario
Qatar

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DRIED EMAD JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012