skip to content

Aboujamra, Jamal

CPSO#: 75603

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 20 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aboujamra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aboujamra ( CPSO# 75603 )

Business Address:
Pape Medical Centre
1018 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 429-6668

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 28 Jun 2022
Summary:

On September 20, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Aboujamra committed professional misconduct when he sexually abused a patient and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in sexual touching of Patient A and making sexual comments to Patient A.  

 

Pursuant to s. 51(4.2) of the Code, the Tribunal ordered that Dr. Aboujamra’s certificate of registration be suspended on an immediate interim basis until a penalty order is made.    

 

More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/.   


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits: 2022-04-25 to 28; 2022-05-04; 2022-06-13 and 28