skip to content

Jakubovic, Baruch David

CPSO#: 100773

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
R. Fraser Elliott Building
Suite 3-805
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-946-0497 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BARUCH DAVID JAKUBOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKUBOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017