skip to content

Jakobowski, Luke

CPSO#: 100946

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
Department of Anesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Endoscopy
5 Quarry Ridge Rd. LL #1
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 797-1112
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUKE JAKOBOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKOBOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018