skip to content

Jakobczyk, Jessica Kim

CPSO#: 90477

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304-350 Oxford St W
London ON  N6H 1T3
Phone: (226) 680-2020
Fax: (226) 680-2021 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jessica Jakobczyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jakobczyk ( CPSO# 90477 )

Business Address:
304-350 Oxford St W
London ON  N6H 1T3
Phone Number: (226) 680-2020

Business Address:
LHSC-Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Nixon Medical Centre
South London Pediatrics
301 - 510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 690-2806

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA KIM JAKOBCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKOBCZYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2014 to 08 Mar 2015
CF - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2015