skip to content

Jairath, Ashish

CPSO#: 96142

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
464 Welland Ave
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Phone: (905) 684-6388 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1370 Clyde Ave
Nepean ON  K2G 3H8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ashok Jairath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:03 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHISH JAIRATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIRATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2019