skip to content

Jain, Vipul

CPSO#: 97236

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Region Medical
8279 Lundy's Lane
Unit A3/A4
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 1H5
Phone: (905) 357-1661
Fax: (905) 371-9090 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 Upper Centennial Pkwy
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3885
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vipul Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. Vipul Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Jain ( CPSO# 97236 )

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Pky
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2

Business Address:
4-8279 Lundy's Lane
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 1H5
Phone Number: 9053571661

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 12 Mar 2012 to 08 Apr 2012
EL - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
EL - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Western University, 30 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Western University, 21 Aug 2014 to 17 Sep 2014
EL - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 11 Feb 2016 to 06 Mar 2016
EL - Occupational Medicine

University Of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 03 Apr 2016
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 04 Apr 2016 to 15 May 2016
EL - Dermatology

McMaster University, 16 May 2016 to 26 May 2016
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2016 Active
             Dr. Vipul Jain may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine and
            Clinical Immunology and Allergy, only.