skip to content

Jain, Subhash Chandra

CPSO#: 29859

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 16 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Vikram University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Subhash Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638 or 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 1-877-398-5932 www.rsrs.com
Instructions: From July 27, 2015, patients may contact the above for medical records.
Date Received: 17 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2015