skip to content

Jain, Michael David

CPSO#: 91283

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Moffitt Cancer Center
CSB 7114
12902 USF Magnolia Drive
Tampa FL  33612
United States
Phone: (813) 745-4673

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:07 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013