skip to content

Jain, Ashu Nitin

CPSO#: 100357

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Jain, Nitin (used until: 17 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
R. Fraser Elliott Building Room 480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3856
Fax: 416-340-4300 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health - Richmond Hill
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ashu Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jain ( CPSO# 100357)

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
R.Fraser Elliott Building-Room 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHU NITIN JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015