skip to content

Jailall, Davindra Naresh

CPSO#: 87767

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120 Ext. 57337 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Davindra Jailall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jailall ( CPSO# 87767 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVINDRA NARESH JAILALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAILALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2019