Jahangirvand, Alex (CPSO#: 99691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
480 Huronia Road, Suite 204
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: 705-503-5800
Fax: 705-503-5801
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alex Jahangirvand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jahangirvand ( CPSO# 99691 )

Business Address:
204 - 480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 503-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX JAHANGIRVAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHANGIRVAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Aug 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016