skip to content

Jagdeo, Dayanand Gouradat

CPSO#: 28087

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Mar 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D.G. Jagdeo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Requests for medical records should be directed to Dr. Jagdeo: PO Box 94064 RPO Bedford Park Toronto ON M4N 3R1
Date Received: 21 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAYANAND GOURADAT JAGDEO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAGDEO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1976