skip to content

Jafari, Katayoon

CPSO#: 91551

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 May 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: 6132761327

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:09 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATAYOON JAFARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 10 Dec 2011 to 09 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 10 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
CF - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018