skip to content

Jacques, Cindi Nicole

CPSO#: 90072

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2008 to 15 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2009 to 15 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2014