skip to content

Jacobson, Michelle Rebecca

CPSO#: 90502

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gynaecology Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
5th floor GYN
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7744
Fax: (416) 323-6237 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Obstetrics Practice
700 University Ave, 3-320
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2739
Fax: (416) 586-3101
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michelle Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jacobson ( CPSO# 90502 )

Business Address:
Suite 3-320
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE REBECCA JACOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014