Jackson, Ted Grant (CPSO#: 100240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: (905) 338-4146
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Kirkland and District Hospital
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 567-5251
Fax: (705) 568-2102
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ted Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jackson ( CPSO# 100240)

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Kirkland and District Hospital
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone Number: (705) 567-5251

Business Address:
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TED GRANT JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015