skip to content

Jabouin, Serge

CPSO#: 52471

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Oct 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:University of Haiti, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
336 Donald St
Ottawa ON  K1K 1M5
Phone: (613) 563-2121
Fax: (613)563-1331 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Serge Jabouin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jabouin ( CPSO# 52471 )

Business Address:
336 Donald Street
Ottawa ON  K1K 1M5
Phone Number: (613) 563-2121


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SERGE JABOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABOUIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1985

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Aug 1994
Summary:

 In August 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Jabouin guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Jabouin be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of three 
 months.  This suspension was itself to be suspended, however, provided that the Doctor agreed to 
 undertake a gender sensitivity counselling program.  The Committee also ordered that periodic 
 reports be made to the Registrar, on a frequency to be agreed upon between the Registrar and the 
 treating physician.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 05 Jun 1996
Hearing Date(s): Aug 22, 1994