skip to content

Jablanczy, Alexander Joseph Nicholas

CPSO#: 29330

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 2-Nov-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For record information for patients who do not register with My Doctor Now please contact: Suite 105 955 Queen Street East Sault Ste Marie, ON P6A 2C3
Date Received: 15 Jun 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 1, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Alexander Joseph Nicholas Jablanczy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 1, 2016:

Dr. Jablanczy was the subject of College investigations into his conduct and communications and his record-keeping in his family medicine practice. During the investigation of these allegations, Dr. Jablanczy resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.

See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)