skip to content

Jaber, Zaid Mohammed Ali

CPSO#: 92141

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Benton Medical Clinic
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Canada
Phone: 226-240-3014
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: 519-749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zaid Jaber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jaber ( CPSO# 92141 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
St Mary Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Phone Number: (226) 240-3014

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iraq
New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZAID MOHAMMED ALI JABER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2009