skip to content

Jaamour, Mohammad

CPSO#: 86502

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 368
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 973-1800
Fax: (519) 973-1805 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

13278 Tecumseh Road E, Suite 207
Tecumseh ON  N9N 3T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 735-0077
Fax: (519) 735-0029
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jaamour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jaamour ( CPSO# 86502 )

Business Address:
South Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 368
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 973-1800

Business Address:
Suite 207
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N9N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-0077


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Jun 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Oct 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008 Active
             Dr.  Mohammad  Jaamour  may  practise  independently  in  the  areas of general
            internal medicine and cardiology only.