Pollock, J Whitcomb (CPSO#: 76274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital--General Campus
Room W1644
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73031
Fax: (613) 737-8837
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Pollock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pollock ( CPSO# 76274 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Suite W1644
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Business Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. J WHITCOMB POLLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006