skip to content

Taliano, John Patrick

CPSO#: 63148

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 23 Oct 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Taliano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Taliano ( CPSO# 63148 )

Business Address:
304 - 180 Vine Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 641-1836

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Access Services Canada, Inc.
Instructions: 1 800 971 8038 Extension 702
Date Received: 08 Dec 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Oct 2020
Summary:

On October 22, 2020, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Taliano committed 
 an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient; and 
 engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.    
 Patient A 
  
 The Committee found that Dr. Taliano engaged in professional misconduct in that he 
 sexually abused Patient A by inappropriately touching his testicles and penis under the 
 guise of a medical examination, and that this also constitutes disgraceful, dishonourable 
or unprofessional conduct. 
 
The Committee also found that Dr. Taliano engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional conduct by telling Patient “A” to “Drop his pants”, and by insisting on 
 examining Patient A despite his protestations and refusal of a genital examination. 
  
 Witness B 
  
 The Committee found that Dr. Taliano engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional conduct by entering the shower of Witness B while naked and touching 
Witness B’s penis, and by making a comment regarding Witness B's penis size in the 
presence of others. 
 
A penalty hearing is to be scheduled. 
 
Please see the Discipline Committee’s full text ‘Decision and Reasons for Decision’ for 
 further information regarding this matter.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: Oct 28, Oct 30, Oct 31 (9:00am to 12:00pm), Nov 1, Nov 18-20, Nov 22, Dec 10, 2019 Penalty Hearing Dates: January 11, 2021

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 10, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: November 29, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Patrick Taliano to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 29, 2018:

Dr. Taliano is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of sexual abuse and/or in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to a patient, who was a minor at the time. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Taliano has agreed not to engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Taliano’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Taliano has agreed not to be alone with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age during any professional encounter.

Dr. Taliano has agreed to post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Taliano has agreed not to have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Taliano has agreed not to be alone with any patient under eighteen (18) years of age during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.