skip to content

Shapiro, Jodi Lynn

CPSO#: 69235

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3-919
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-8817
Fax: (416) 586-4746 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jodi L. Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shapiro ( CPSO# 69235 )

Business Address:
Suite 3-919
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8817

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JODI LYNN SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000