skip to content

Sarrazin, Josee

CPSO#: 66362

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department of Radiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 5732
Fax: (416) 480-5855 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Schull Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. M. Schull ( CPSO# 61754 )

Business Address:
Evaluative Clinical Sciences
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G258 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5388


Corporation Name: Dr. Josee Sarrazin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. M. Schull ( CPSO# 61754 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
M-Ground - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4M 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEE SARRAZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARRAZIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1994