skip to content

Sandhu, Janmeet

CPSO#: 99128

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Sardar Patel Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone: (416) 244-8404
Fax: (416) 244-0310 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fandor Medical Centre
15 Fandor Way, Unit 2A
Brampton ON  L7A 4S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 970-1222
Fax: (905) 970-9666
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Janmeet Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017
Corporation Name: Janmeet and Guninder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sandhu ( CPSO# 99127 )
Dr. J. Sandhu ( CPSO# 99128 )

Business Address:
2G-1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone Number: (647) 248-8011

Business Address:
Suite 2A
15 Fandor Way
Brampton ON  L7A 4S2
Phone Number: (905) 970-1222

Business Address:
Suite 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone Number: (416) 244-8404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015 Active
             Dr. Janmeet Sandhu may practise medicine independently in family medicine.