skip to content

Samoila, John Paul

CPSO#: 82340

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Nov 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 735-1490
Fax: (519) 735-6236 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samoila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Samoila ( CPSO# 82340 )

Business Address:
Suite 206 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-1490


Corporation Name: Amster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Samoila ( CPSO# 82340 )
Dr. S. Amster ( CPSO# 91799 )

Business Address:
169 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B6
Phone Number: (519) 961-9436

Business Address:
206 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-1490


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL SAMOILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMOILA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2006
Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.