skip to content

Salvendy, John Thomas

CPSO#: 23687

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Vienna, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
120 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 710
Toronto ON  M4P 1E2
Phone: (416) 932-9770 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Salvendy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Salvendy ( CPSO# 23687 )

Business Address:
Suite 710
120 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 932-9770

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS SALVENDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALVENDY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.