skip to content

Rubenstein, Joel Don

CPSO#: 29908

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Louisville, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Department of Medical Imaging 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N3M5
Date Received: 05 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020