skip to content

Rosset, Jennifer Ellen

CPSO#: 76059

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3292 Bayview Ave
Suite 201
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: 416-551-1311
Fax: 647-480-5043 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Rosset Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rosset ( CPSO# 22140 )
Dr. J. Rosset ( CPSO# 76059 )

Business Address:
3292 Bayview Ave
Suite 201
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: 416-551-1311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELLEN ROSSET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003