skip to content

Parker, Jeffrey William

CPSO#: 95449

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Parker ( CPSO# 95115 )
Dr. J. Parker ( CPSO# 95449 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:22 Aug 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 23 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2013