skip to content

Niedoba, Joseph Edward

CPSO#: 30079

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1978
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Davis Center
80 Allan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 1P7
Phone: (905) 857-0975
Fax: (905) 857-7872 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Husky Injection Molding Systems
500 Queen Street South
Bolton ON  L7E 5S5
Canada
Phone: (905) 951-5000 Ext. 2258
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Malton Village
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 4H1
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-1179
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Kristus Darzs
11290 Pine Vallet Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4L 1A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 832-3300
Fax: (905) 832-2029
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Niedoba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Niedoba ( CPSO# 30079 )

Business Address:
11290 Pine Valley Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4L 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 832-3300

Business Address:
Davis Centre
80 Allan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 1P7
Phone Number: (905) 857-0975

Business Address:
Malton Village
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 4H1
Phone Number: (905) 791-1179

Business Address:
Husky Injection Molding Systems
500 Queen Street South
Bolton ON  L7E 5S5
Phone Number: (905) 951-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH EDWARD NIEDOBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEDOBA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1978

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)