skip to content

Nazareno, Janice Jie Yang

CPSO#: 77684

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Names: Yang Nazareno, Janice Jie (used until: 04 Jun 2006 )     Yang, Janice Jie (used until: 30 May 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
Department of Radiology
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8200 Ext. 6273
Fax: (416) 431-8169 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2867 Ellesmere Rd.
Scarborough
Ontario
M1E 4B9
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

75 Ann St.
Bracebridge
Ontario
P1L 2E4
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: 705-789-2311
Fax: 705-789-0557
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

1815 Ironstone Manor, Suite 15B
Pickering
Ontario
L1W 3W9
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Canada
Phone: 905-831-1800
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

2867 Ellesmere Rd.
Scarborough
Ontario
M1E 4B9
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: 416-284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3030 Birchmount Rd.
Scarborough
M1W 3W3
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: 416-495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

580 Harwood Ave. S.
Ajax
Ontario
L1S 2J4
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: 905-683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1815 Ironstone Manor, Suite 15B
Pickering
Ontario
L1W 3W9
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Canada
Phone: 905-831-1800
Fax: 905-831-1800
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )

Business Address:
UVM Health Network-CVPH
Radiology Department
75 Beekman Street
Plattsburgh NY  129 1

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107


Corporation Name: Janice Nazareno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiology
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Suite G03
3000 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANICE JIE YANG NAZARENO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAZARENO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008