skip to content

Meharchand, Jacinta Mary

CPSO#: 33394

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-3325
Fax: (416) 469-8221 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Meharchand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Meharchand ( CPSO# 33394 )
Dr. I. Quirt ( CPSO# 22989 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
K2 Wing
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-3325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACINTA MARY MEHARCHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHARCHAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1984