skip to content

Macintyre, John Dugald

CPSO#: 28362

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Macintyre, John Douglas (used until: 03 Nov 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John D. MacIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Parkside Medical Clinic 15B-115 Hamilton St N Waterdown ON L8B 1A8
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019