skip to content

Lim, Jason Hue Fung

CPSO#: 114092

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302-280 Spadina Ave
Toronto ON  M5T 3A5
Phone: (416) 977-9888 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bill Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lim ( CPSO# 31635 )
Dr. H. Lim ( CPSO# 88825 )
Dr. J. Lim ( CPSO# 114092)

Business Address:
302B - 280 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 3A5
Phone Number: (416) 977-9888

Business Address:
4631 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 4S5
Phone Number: (416) 293-6600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASON HUE FUNG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2019