skip to content

Lafleche, Jean Pierre

CPSO#: 32987

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Nov 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 746-6745
Fax: (613) 746-6008 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jean Pierre Lafleche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bishop ( CPSO# 30144 )
Dr. J. Lafleche ( CPSO# 32987 )

Business Address:
202 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6745

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN PIERRE LAFLECHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFLECHE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1981